This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2020 at 10:43:15 (UTC).

TURNER VS. MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2010 TURNER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Palmer, William D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0043

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Palmer, William D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TURNER, KAREN

Defendants

MENTOR NATIONAL HEALTHCARE LLC

CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBRO, RICHARD S

Defendant Attorney

WINFIELD, ALECIA W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2011
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Original Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: TRIAL DATE: 05/02/11//5 DAYS TRIAL DATE: 05/02/11//5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial - Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: RICHARD S. DEBRO ESQ. RE: TURNER VS. MENTOR MANAGEMENT, Case No. S-1500-CV-270043, WDP NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached RICHARD S. DEBRO ESQ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:TURNER VS. MENTOR MANAGEMENT, Case No. S-1500-CV-270043, WDP __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. X Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/10/2010. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: RICHARD S. DEBRO ESQ. RE: TURNER VS. MENTOR MANAGEMENT, Case No. S-1500-CV-270043, WDP NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS X The attached RICHARD S. DEBRO ESQ papers are being returned for the following reason(s): __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:TURNER VS. MENTOR MANAGEMENT, Case No. S-1500-CV-270043, WDP __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. X Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/10/2010. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Comment: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 4/19/2011, in Department 15, before the Honorable WILLIAM D PALMER, pursuant to an Order to Appear to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1385. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ WILLIAM D PALMER Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION The above-entitled cause came on regularly on 4/19/2011, in Department 15, before the Honorable WILLIAM D PALMER, pursuant to an Order to Appear to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1385. Good cause appearing therefore, on the Court's own motion, it is by the Court Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the above-entitled cause be, and the same is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ WILLIAM D PALMER Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketNP4170 - Comment: Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY ANY PARTY OR COUNSEL OF RECORD. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • Docket4170 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 03/04/11 [ 3.1385 ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Original Type: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED 03/04/11 [ 3.1385 ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Original Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: TRIAL DATE: 05/02/11 FINAL CMC: 04/22/11 TRIAL DATE: 05/02/11 FINAL CMC: 04/22/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ~ calid=1378898 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4146, CourtDate:07/25/2011, Courtroom:15, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:6, SessionType:CFM, Judge:WDP, Deputy:jeniferg, SystemDate:1/12/2011 2:29:06 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ~ calid=1378897 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4000, CourtDate:07/25/2011, Courtroom:15, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:5, SessionType:CTC, Judge:WDP, Deputy:jeniferg, SystemDate:1/12/2011 2:28:36 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2010
  • Docket801L Pmt: First Appearance Unlimited Civil GC 70612 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $355.00 for MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. (DE-1). Received from JANNEY & JANNEY, check no(s) 295117. Receipt #529391 for amount of $355.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: DIANE L KIMBERLIN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: 7/15/10, OSC HRG VACATED-ACKNOWLEDGMENT FILED 5/13/10. ~ calid=1247726 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:07/15/2010, Courtroom:15, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:WDP, Deputy:ROBINM, SystemDate:4/26/2010 5:23:04 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED:NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT WHO SERVED:THE MENTOR NETWORK HOW SERVED:MAIL DATE SERVED:4/29/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "WDP" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER ON Sep 28, 2010 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "WDP" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER ON Sep 28, 2010 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 15, 2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_15 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jul 15, 2010 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_15 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • Docket800L Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (7/28/09) - Comment: Amount of $355.00 for TURNER, KAREN (PL-1). Received from LAW OFFC OF RICHARD S DEBRO, check no(s) 1948. Receipt #517614 for amount of $355.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: ROCHARD S. DEBRO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Mentor is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINFIELD ALECIA W.