This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:00:17 (UTC).

TRUITT VS TRUITT(B)

Case Summary

On 03/20/2015 TRUITT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TRUITT B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brown, Joanne, Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D., Copelan, James B., Benavides, Jose R., Stainfield, Bryan K., Cannon, Gloria, McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Robertson, Murray J. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1856

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brown, Joanne

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Copelan, James B.

Benavides, Jose R.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Cannon, Gloria

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Robertson, Murray J.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRUITT, JAMES

Respondent

TRUITT, CAROLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA, XOCHITL M

Respondent Attorney

RUBIO, NIEVES

Other Attorneys

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Attorney at FLOYD & HORRIGAN

903 H St #200

Bakersfield, CA 93304

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 02/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/27/16 RES PRODUCE INS CHECK ATTY F/C CONTD FROM 3/28/17 5/22/17 6/19/17 8/21/17 9/11/17 1/24/18; Parties Present Petitioner: TRUITT, JAMES; Respondent: TRUITT, CAROLINA; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/27/16 RES PRODUCE INS CHECK ATTY F/C CONT'D FROM 3/28/17 5/22/17 6/19/17 8/21/17 9/11/17; Parties Present Respondent: TRUITT, CAROLINA; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Ruling

Ruling 12/15/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Petitioner

04/26/16 MO (3) REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT /PETITIONER/ RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S ATTY F/C FINANCIAL ISSUES CONT FROM 12/04/15 01/04/16 02/09/16; Parties Present Petitioner: TRUITT, JAMES; Respondent: TRUITT, CAROLINA; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Ruling

03/23/16 Ruling- Resetting of Hearing Dates/Clarificaiton: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Respondent

REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION,: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RESP CC CV PROPERTY CONTROL, INSURANCE PROCEEDS, DRUG TESTING CONT FROM 12/04/15; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Respondent

Public Minute Order Document Type: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP CNTRL INSURANCE PROCEEDS DRUG TESTING 3 MINORS CONTD FROM 11/4/15 PENDING DRUG RESULTS; Parties Present Petitioner: TRUITT, JAMES; Respondent: TRUITT, CAROLINA; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO 11/4/15 RFO PET: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: C/C C/V C/S ATTY F/C CONTD FROM 9/15/15 & 10/14/15 PENDING DRUG RESULTS STATUS ONLY; Parties Present Petitioner: TRUITT, JAMES; Respondent; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Ex Parte Hearing

Minute Order for 10/21/15 Ex Parte: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP CNTRL RANDOM DRUG TESTING 3 MINOR CONTD FROM 10/20/15 *TO BE HEARD AT 9:00AM*; Parties Present Petitioner: TRUITT, JAMES; Respondent: TRUITT, CAROLINA; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES PRODUCE INS CHECK ATTY F/C CONT'D FROM 2/28/17

Request for Order - Respondent

Original Type: Request for Order - Respondent; Request for Order - Respondent 01/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES PRODUCE INS CHECK ATTY F/C CONT'D FROM 11/16/16 12/19/16

Request for Order - Respondent

Original Type: Request for Order - Respondent; 12/19/16 MO- REQUEST FOR ORDER - RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES PRODUCE INS CHECK ATTY F/C CONT'D FROM 11/16/16

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/29/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RES PRODUCE INS CHECK ATTY F/C; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Respondent

05/26/16 MO: REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER/RESPONDENT: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES C/C C/V PROP CNTRL INS PROCEEDS DRUG TEST CONT FROM 5/19/16; Parties Present Petitioner: TRUITT, JAMES; Respondent: TRUITT, CAROLINA; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, ATTORNEY: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET CC, CV CS ATTY FEE/COST FINANCIAL ISSUES CONT FROM 12/04/15

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, CHILD: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S ATTY F/C CONTD FROM 11/16/15; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: RUBIO, NIEVES

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, CHILD: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C CONT FROM 06/09/15

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER CHILD CUSTODY, CHILD VISITATION, CHILD: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C MINORS

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: HRG: 6/12/19 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketDCSS: Advisement of Rights Pursuant to FC 4251(b)(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Modification) - Motion - DCSS (Modification) 06/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/11/19 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDERS 3 MINORS Hearing Date: 6/12/19 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: STATUS ENDS 1/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JUDGMENT RET'D TO N. RUBIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order - Original Type: Request for Order; Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C MINOR CHILDREN NOT TO BE AROUND LEONARD BOYLES3 MINORS PET C/C C/V C/S S/S ATTY F/C MINOR CHILDREN NOT TO BE AROUND LEONARD BOYLES3 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • Docket4999 Mediation Appointment - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: SET BY FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • DocketApplication for Reissuance of Order to Show Cause - Comment: PET NEW HRG DATE: 5/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Docket171F Pmt: Reconciliation Motion GC 70677(A) & 70678 - Comment: Amount of $85.00 for TRUITT, JAMES (PE-1). Received from GEORGE HORRIGAN, check no(s) 63340. Receipt #830218 for amount of $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for TRUITT, JAMES (PE-1). Received from GEORGE HORRIGAN, check no(s) 63340. Receipt #830217 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET HRG DATE: 4/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.