This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 18:05:00 (UTC).

TROWER VS TROWER (C)

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 TROWER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TROWER C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2523

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TROWER, NIKOLAUS

Respondent

TROWER, HANNAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Respondent Attorney

GRASS, ROGER R

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 08/09/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES EX PARTE C/C C/V 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: HRG 06/26/17 DIV C PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 06/01/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE RES CC CV APPT MINOR'S COUNSEL 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 5/30/17; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 05/30/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EX PARTE RES C/C C/V APPT MINORS COUNSEL 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 06/01/17 RES C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 6/26/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 05/23/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EX PARTE PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTING SUPERVISED VISIT STATEMENT OF DECISION 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 05/24/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE PET CC CV DRUG TESTING SUPERVISED VISIT STATEMENT OF DECISION CONT'D FROM 5/23/17; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/24/17 PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTING STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/24/17 PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTINGS STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 6/26/17 AND 8/14/17; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • Mediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/24/17 PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTINGS STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 6/26/17 AND 8/14/17; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: 6/01/17 RES C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 6/26/17 AND 8/14/17; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: 08/09/17 RES MOD C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: Continued from 9/06/2017 at 3:30 p.m. KEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Respondent 08/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 05/24/17 PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTING STMNT OF DEC 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 6/26/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 08/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 06/01/17 RES C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 6/26/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: GRANTED WITH MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 09/12/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2017
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice of Acknowledgement and Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Temporary Emergency Court Orders Issued (FL-305) - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Drug Screening Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 05/24/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE PET CC CV DRUG TESTING SUPERVISED VISIT STATEMENT OF DECISION CONT'D FROM 5/23/17; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 05/23/2017: Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: EX PARTE PET C/C C/V DRUG TESTING SUPERVISED VISIT STATEMENT OF DECISION 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: TROWER, NIKOLAUS; Attorney: KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R; Respondent: TROWER, HANNAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Ex Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 05/23/17 Hearing Time: 11:00AM Hearing Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.