This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 15:03:23 (UTC).

TRIPLE T LEASING, LLC VS JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2014 TRIPLE T LEASING, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3647

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIPLE T LEASING, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JIMENEZ, BENTURA ANTHONY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

TJS CONSTRUCTION

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation

Cross Defendants

HIBBITS, TERRY

BENTURA ANTHONY JIMENEZ doing business as TJS CONSTRUCTION

TRIPLE T LEASING, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

PALACPAC, TONY

TITAN OILFIELD SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRIPLE T LEASING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

POTTER, DAVID B

Attorney at ARRACHE & POTTER

4800 Easton Dr #114

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STROJ, ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

6/12/15 Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

Motion for Leave

Minute Order - Motion for Leave - 11/17/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/21/15 Defendant, AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint for Interpleader ********************************************** TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION. ************************************************

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

3/11/16 MO: Motion to Quash: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 2/3/16, by Cross/Defendant, Daniela Soberman. Motion to Quash Interpleader Action. ************************************************** TENTATIVE: DENY MOTION TO QUASH. CROSS-DEFENDANT SOBERMAN TO FILE A STAND-ALONE ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER. ********************************************************

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

4/8/16 MO: Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial.: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/07/2016 Defendant Ex parte application for order continuing trial or in the alternative vacating trial date and setting a case management conference.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

Ruling

Ruling 09/21/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) 10/03/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/6/16 Defendant, BENTURA ANTHONY JIMENEZ dba TJS CONSTRUCTION Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ResID: 17883 TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR HEARING ONLY. DEPARTMENT 4 IS DARK.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

Ruling

Minute Order 10/28/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

**MO - Public: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/21/2016 Plaintiff/Cross-Defendants, Triple T. Leasing, LLC and Titan Oilfield Services, Inc.; Cross-Defendants, Tony Palacpac and Terry Hibbits Application for Order to Bifurcate the Trial as to Defendant, Bentura Anthony Jimenez; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

Mandatory Settlement Conference

**MO msc w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E 4 days CFM/TD 12-12-16

Final Case Management Conference

12/12/16 MO: Amended MO re: FCMC/Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: T/E: 4 days, held at trial; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

02/03/17 MO: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3.1385

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 03/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of Complaint, as to Defendant Bentura AnthonyJimenez (Cont'd from 02/03/2017); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 03/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for failure to pursue the claim, directed to cross-complainant, Bentura Anthony Jimenez dba TJS Construction; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POTTER, DAVID B

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 03/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of COMPLAINT, as to Defendant Bentura Anthony Jimenez ****Also has OSC at 8:30 (Cont'd from 02/03/17; 03/07/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 03/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for failure to pursue the claim, directed to cross-complainant, Bentura Anthony Jimenez dba TJS Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 03/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal of Complaint, as to Defendant Bentura AnthonyJimenez (Cont'd from 02/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Progress

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - 02/03/17 MO: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Partial dismissal entered on December 21, 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to American Contractors Indemnity Company only, with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: ACIC's Request for Dismissal as to its Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: (DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONTRA CTORS INDEMNITY COMAPNY) FILED BY KAREL RABA ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: DEFAULT ONLY AS TO BENTURA ANTHONY JIMENEZ DBA TJS CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO BENTURA ANTHONY JIMENEZ DBA TJS CONSTRUCTION PERSONALLY SERVED 12/23/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO AMERICAN CONTRACTORS IDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SUBSERVED 12/17/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 03, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Apr 03, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for TRIPLE T LEASING, LLC (PL-1). Received from ARRACHE & POTTER, check no(s) 10376. Receipt #813046 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY DAVID B. POTTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY DAVID B. POTTER CMC SET 6/12/15 @8:00AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROJ, ROBERT J