This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/16/2016 at 08:53:35 (UTC).

TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS FOX, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FOX. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0039

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

FOX, LORRI D

FOX, WALTER J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUER, CHRISTOPHER L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G., Hearing Time: 10:00 AM, Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered, Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Walter J. Fox and Lorri D. Fox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: As to Lorri D Fox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to All Unkown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Lorri D. Fox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Walter J. Fox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TRINITY FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, Person to Serve: FOX, WALTER J, Served: 07/19/2015, Person to Serve: FOX, LORRI D, Served: 07/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 110 ROSE AVENUE TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via In ProPer/Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint/Unlawful Detainer Action Based on CCP 1161A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less