This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:54:17 (UTC).

TRIBBLE VS TRIBBLE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 TRIBBLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TRIBBLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Schuett, Stephen D. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1646

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRIBBLE, ASHLEIGH

Respondent

TRIBBLE, DEVON

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

MO - 10/01/15: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: EST TIME 30MIN-1HR; Parties Present Petitioner: TRIBBLE, ASHLEIGH; Respondent: TRIBBLE, DEVON

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; RESP FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: TRIBBLE, DEVON

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: STATUS 1/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Mediation Agreement - Comment: JLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - MO - 10/01/15: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: EST TIME 30MIN-1HR; Parties Present Petitioner: TRIBBLE, ASHLEIGH; Respondent: TRIBBLE, DEVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 10/1/15 Hearing Time: 1:30PM Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • At Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; RESP FEE WAIVER GRANTED: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00; Parties Present Respondent: TRIBBLE, DEVON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Master, Calendar Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less