This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 06:39:56 (UTC).

TRENT VS DR. ROBERT S. PORT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 TRENT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DR ROBERT S PORT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1475

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRENT, DANIELLE

Defendants

DR. ROBERT S. PORT

SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, A CORPORATION

SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

ROBERT S. PORT M.D

VIRTUITY HOSPITALISTS, PC

CEP AMERICA LLC

CEP AMERICA, CALIFORNIA (DOE 1)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWAIM, BRYAN C

BORDIN-WOSK, JOSHUA

Defendant Attorneys

DIAMOND, SCOTT R

THELEN, DENNIS R

SCHAEFFER, JAMES C

GARBER, DANA A

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 01/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 11/21/2019

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 11/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFAULT/JUDGMENT

Ruling

Ruling 08/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Please separate the Proposed order from the declaration. Returned via efile

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 12/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/21/18 Defendant, ROBERT S. PORT, M.D. Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication ResID: 32994

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) sanctions & 3.110 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110 AND FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 10/12/2017; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: SWAIM, BRYAN C

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/12/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC/Jury Trial 09/21/2020 (170 T/E 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 3/6/2020, Defendant, Attorney Dana Garber, Contact 805-988-9200 Bea Motion to Compel Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 01/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 11/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFAULT/JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) sanctions & 3.110 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTA ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) sanctions & 3.110 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110 AND FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF BRYAN C. SWAIM RE: NON-APPEARANCE AT OCTOBER 12, 2017 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/22/2017; Served: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/12/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less