This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 09:27:25 (UTC).

TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA VS ALL AMERICAN CARPET, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALL AMERICAN CARPET, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2177

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Defendants

CENTRAL CAL STAIRS, INC.

FLAMECO FIREPLACE SPECIALISTS

FROST HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING

ROSEDALE CERAMIC TILE & MARBLE

JRJ CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.

HOLDENS AIR CONDITIONING & HEATING, INC.

MILLWOOD CABINET CO., INC.

PAVLETICH ELECTRIC & COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

BOONE CONSTRUCTION

MAJESTIC ROOFING

HOLLINGSEAD MASONRY

PETE HAMLET PLUMBING, INC.

SO CAL FINISH CARPENTRY

ACCURATE TRENCHING DBA UTILITY CONNECTORS

BRIAN MAURO CONSTRUCTION DBA NORCAL ELECTRIC

PARKS & SON CONSTRUCTION

CASKEY CORPORATION DBA CENTURY GLASS

WESTERN INSULATION

LOMAN PAINTERS, INC.

LOGIE LAM CORPORATION DBA PETE HAMLET PLUMBING

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PEZOLD, DANIEL G

CRESPO, DANIEL A

BROMGARD, TODD D

Other Attorneys

AGUILERA, A ERIC

MULLEN, RAY T

AU, PATRICK

CRAWFORD, DAVID

JONES, TODD A

BOARDMAN, NORA R

CULLINS, DARREN R

GORDON, GREGORY H

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

TANGONAN, KENYA T

LUHRING, SUSAN E

VAHDAT, AVA

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

BELL, JACOB

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Stay (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Stay (Pre-Disposition) 11/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 10/16/17 Defendant, WESTERN INSULATION, L.P. erroneously sued and served as WESTERN INSULATION Motion to Stay Action ResID: 27126; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BOARDMAN, NORA R; Defendant; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G; Defendant; Attorney: TANGONAN, KENYA T; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G; Defendant; Attorney: MULLEN, RAY T; Defendant; Attorney: MULLEN, RAY T

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 06/22/17; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BOARDMAN, NORA R; Defendant; Attorney: TANGONAN, KENYA T; Defendant; Attorney: MULLEN, RAY T; Defendant; Attorney: MULLEN, RAY T; Defendant; Attorney: CULLINS, DARREN R

Ruling

Minute Order: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BOARDMAN, NORA R; Defendant; Attorney: TANGONAN, KENYA T; Defendant; Attorney: MULLEN, RAY T; Defendant; Attorney: MULLEN, RAY T; Defendant; Attorney: JONES, TODD A

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER: DEFENDANT MAJESTINC ROOFING HAS BEEN DEFAULTED. DEFAULT FILED ON 1/6/17.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: DEFENDANT ALL AMERICAN CARPET, INC., HAS BEEN DEFAULTED. DEFAULT FILED ON 1/6/17.

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: ANSWER PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 12/30/16 BY THE LAW OFFICE OF BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA.

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/18/17 Moving Party, McMILLAN ALBANY, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company, and McMILLAN PARK AVENUE, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Motion for Protective Order Related Case: S-1500-CV-279141 ResID: 25527; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: CRESPO, DANIEL A

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-13-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G; Defendant; Attorney: TANGONAN, KENYA T; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G; Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID; Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID; Defendant; Attorney: CULLINS, DARREN R; Defendant; Attorney: GORDON, GREGORY H; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID; Defendant; Attorney: CRAWFORD, DAVID

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER: DEFENDANT ACCURATE TRENCHING, INC. HAS BEEN DEFAULTED. DEFAULT FILED ON 1/6/17.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO ANGELA ZANIN: REJECTED REQUEST FOR DEFAULT. THIS COURT DOES NOT HAVE A PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANT BARRERA & KNIGHT CONSTRUCTION

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/29/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Association of Attorney: Cross-Defendant was dismissed as of 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Defendant HOLLINGSEAD MASONRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Defendant MILLWOOD CABINET CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Majestic Roofing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Rosedale Ceramic Tile and Marble

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to JRJ Concrete Construction, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Pablo Lopez Drywall

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: affidavit of due diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: affidavit of due diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: affidavit of due diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: On Complaint, as to Defendants Mike's Fencing, Inc. and Irv Guinn Construction, ONLY Dismissed WITHOUT prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 09/30/2016; Served: 10/02/2016; Unserved; Served: 01/25/2017; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 10/05/2016; Served: 10/03/2016; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 10/03/2016; Served: 11/04/2016; Served: 10/02/2016; Unserved; Served: 10/02/2016; Unserved; Served: 11/03/2016; Served: 10/10/2016; Served: 10/04/2016; Served: 12/28/2016; Served: 10/04/2016; Served: 10/14/2016; Served: 10/02/2016; Served: 10/03/2016; Served: 10/04/2016; Served: 11/27/2016; Served: 11/02/2016; Served: 10/03/2016; Served: 10/10/2016; Unserved; Served: 10/02/2016; Served: 10/02/2016; Served: 10/04/2016; Served: 11/12/2016; Unserved; Served: 10/01/2016; Served: 10/03/2016; Served: 10/02/2016; Served: 10/03/2016; Served: 11/03/2016; Served: 10/06/2016; Served: 10/06/2016; Served: 10/03/2016; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 09/30/2016; Served: 09/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: S-1500-CV-279141- DRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/29/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less