This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 05:27:10 (UTC).

TOVAR VS CORE-MARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 TOVAR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CORE-MARK INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1722

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOVAR, LEONARDO

Defendant

CORE-MARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTON S BRETT

Defendant Attorney

AZZARA PHILIP J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

07/19/2022: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

Case Management Conference

01/24/2022: Case Management Conference

Ruling

11/18/2021: Ruling

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

01/28/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Case Management Statement

01/07/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

01/07/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

09/28/2021: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Answer to First Amended Complaint

09/22/2021: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Proof of Service

08/24/2021: Proof of Service

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

08/24/2021: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

First Amended Complaint

08/13/2021: First Amended Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/05/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/05/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Electronic Rejection Notice

07/28/2021: Electronic Rejection Notice

Order to Show Cause

07/28/2021: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

07/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

07/28/2021: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Comment: with prejudice as complaint, entire action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CORE-MARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.|PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Audio streaming announced.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: HRG 1/24/22 @ 8:30 am in Division H; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Hrg: 1/24/22 @ 8:30 am in Division H; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CORE-MARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: as to Core-Mark Interrelated Companies, Inc., without prejudice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to First Amended Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - CORE-MARK INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: of the First Amended Complaint as to Core-Mark Interrelated Companies, Inc., a California corporation via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Comment: on the First Amended Complaint as to Core-Mark International, Inc., a Delaware corporation via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Comment: of Leonardo Tovar; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Core-Mark Interrelated Companies, Inc., a California corporation via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: Core-Mark International, Inc., a Delaware corporation via personal service.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: TO: Attorney, S. Brett SuttonRE: Civil Case Cover SheetREASON: Case Name field is incomplete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 11/10/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30amHearing Department/Division: 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TOVAR, LEONARDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less