Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 08:11:05 (UTC).

TORREZ VS TORREZ(B)

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 TORREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TORREZ B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cannon, Gloria and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3378

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cannon, Gloria

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORREZ, ESPERANZA

Respondent

TORREZ, GONZALO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS 05/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure - Comment: E FILED Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: POS: INCORRECT FORM SUBMITTED ENV# 05284103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less