This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 11:17:50 (UTC).

TORRES GONZALEZ VS MEDINA

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 TORRES GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEDINA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1794

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES GONZALEZ, ANTONIO

Defendants

MEDINA, JOSE

M & J FARM LABOR CONTRACTOR INCORPORATED, A CORPORATION

MEDINA, JOSE, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REZAI, FARI A

Defendant Attorney

WOODS, SARA J.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: John S Rosenberg Re: Request for dismissal of application for lien Reason: the filing date of lien is incorrec on the dismissal form submitted

Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Conference 08/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case management statement rejected: Missing case number. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Association of Attorney rejected in File and Serve

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Missing attorney of record signature, attorney Fari Rezai. Returned via efile

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER RECEIVED AND CHECK #3795; SANCTIONS HAVE NOT YET BEEN IMPOSED. RETURNING CHECK BACK TO LAW OFFICES OF REZAI & ASSOCIATES

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/16/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: on request for dismissmal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejduice as to Application for Lien dated 7/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: John S Rosenberg Re: Request for dismissal of application for lien Reason: the filing date of lien is incorrec on the dismissal form submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: as attorney for Lien Claimant, Insurance Company of the West

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: & final case management con-current. estimate 6 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 6-7 days CFM/TD 11-26-2018

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 11/16/2017 AND FAILING TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER RECEIVED AND CHECK #3795; SANCTIONS HAVE NOT YET BEEN IMPOSED. RETURNING CHECK BACK TO LAW OFFICES OF REZAI & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/05/2017; Served: 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:11/16/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less