Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:06:49 (UTC).

TORRES ET AL VS HINOJOSA

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HINOJOSA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0468

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES

Defendant

HINOJOSA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS AS TO BOTH COUNSEL FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON 01/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Re; notice of settlement Returned via USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: as to entire action without prejudice. Returned via sase

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Re; dismissal filed by Ricardo Chavez. 2nd rejection. Returned via; usps

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to complaint. Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: of Logan Quirk in support of request to discharge 2-16-16 OSC. Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Re; dismissal filed by ricardo chavez Returned via; SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Re; notice of settlement Returned via; USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Cross Complaint - Comment: of Andrew Hinojosa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by substituted service as to Andrew Hinojosa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less