Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 09:40:01 (UTC).

TOP FINANCE COMPANY INC VS GARZA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 TOP FINANCE COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0031

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOP FINANCE COMPANY INC

Defendant

GARZA, FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNSTAD, BRYANT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TOP FINANCE COMPANY INC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Top Finance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnstad, Bryant