Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:39 (UTC).

TITAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC. VS PRIGMORE

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 TITAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRIGMORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0980

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TITAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.

Defendants

PRIGMORE, KATHLEEN

PRIGMORE, LELAND

PRIGMORE, MARGRET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: TITAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 4032 O STREET, UNIT 7, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: PRIGMORE, LELAND; PRIGMORE, MARGRET; PRIGMORE, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via AMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: As to Leland Prigmore, Margret Prigmore and Kathleen Prigmore.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Kathleen Prigmore.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Leland Prigmore.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Margret Prigmore.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TITAL REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 4032 O STREET, UNIT 7, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less