This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/06/2022 at 03:44:12 (UTC).

TIGER TANKS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS M DRILL, A BUSINESS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 TIGER TANKS, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against M DRILL, A BUSINESS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0148

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIGER TANKS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

M DRILL, A BUSINESS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DODGIN DUSTIN S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Complaint

01/11/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

01/13/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

01/13/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

01/13/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice

03/30/2022: Notice

Notice

03/30/2022: Notice

Request for Dismissal (Entire)

06/15/2022: Request for Dismissal (Entire)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TIGER TANKS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Standing Order-Reassignment of civil cases from Department 12 and Division G to Division L and declaration of mailing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TIGER TANKS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TIGER TANKS, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIGER TANKS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DODGIN DUSTIN S