This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 04:21:49 (UTC).

TIDWELL VS TIDWELL(B)

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 TIDWELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TIDWELL B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3192

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TIDWELL, COREY

Respondent

TIDWELL, NATALIE

Minor

COUNSEL, MINOR'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor Attorney

CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 07/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 1 MINOR; Parties Present Petitioner: TIDWELL, COREY; Respondent: TIDWELL, NATALIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/11/18 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: TIDWELL, COREY; Respondent: TIDWELL, NATALIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/11/18 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONT FROM 08/15/18; Parties Present Petitioner: TIDWELL, COREY; Respondent: TIDWELL, NATALIE; Minor Party: COUNSEL, MINOR'S; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 12/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/11/18 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONT FROM 08/15/18 10/17/18 **SUBPOENAED RECORDS SENT W/FILE**; Parties Present Petitioner: TIDWELL, COREY; Respondent: TIDWELL, NATALIE; Minor Party; Court Appointed: CHILDERS, STEPHANIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/11/18 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR CONT FROM 08/15/18 10/17/18 12/3/18; Parties Present Petitioner: TIDWELL, COREY; Respondent: TIDWELL, NATALIE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 08/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/18/19 RES DV/TRO PROP RSTRNT INS 2 MINORS *RES 1ST CONT FROM 08/06/19*

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/29/19 RES S/S COMPEL COMPLIANCE W/ DISCLOSURES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 07/18/19 RES DV/TRO PROP RSTRNT INS 2 MINORS *RES 1ST CONT FROM 08/06/19 8/20/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 7/29/19 RES S/S COMPEL COMPLIANCE W/ DISCLOSURES CONT FROM 8/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 08/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/29/19 RES S/S COMPEL COMPLIANCE W/ DISCLOSURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketResponse to Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: Order EXP 10/1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 08/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/18/19 RES DV/TRO PROP RSTRNT INS 2 MINORS *RES 1ST CONT FROM 08/06/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 08/20/19 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 8/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 8/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 8/15/18 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Ex Parte Hearing 07/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET EX PARTE C/C C/V 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 07/11/18 Hearing Time: 11AM Hearing Department/Division:MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNSEL, MINOR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILDERS, STEPHANIE