This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 21:08:51 (UTC).

TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC VS TINAJERO

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TINAJERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0093

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIDEWATER FINANCE DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC

TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC

Defendant

TINAJERO, MARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRIFFIN, BENJAMIN K.

PRENOVOST, THOMAS J, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC; Awarded Against: TINAJERO, MARIO; Amount; Damages: $2,060.84; Attorney Fees: $300.00; Costs: $290.00; Total: $2650.84; Party: Names: TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC; TINAJERO, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Admitting a Copy of the Contract into Evidence in Lieu of The Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: in Support of Including Plaintiff's Cost in the Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY DBA TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICE, LLC; Served: 04/27/20165:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketLetter Mailed - Comment: Re: Statement of Classification

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.