This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 06:07:33 (UTC).

TIBBALS VS BAILEY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 TIBBALS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BAILEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0126

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIBBALS, EDWIN

Defendant

BAILEY, SUSAN O

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: TIBBALS, EDWIN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3443 Minnesota Trail Frazier Park, CA 93225; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: BAILEY, SUSAN O; Party: Names: TIBBALS, EDWIN; BAILEY, SUSAN O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Writ Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original via In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Susan O. Bailey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: by personal service as to Susan O. Bailey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TIBBALS, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 3443 MINNESOTA TRAIL FRAZIER PARK, CA 93225

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less