This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 09:24:49 (UTC).

THRONEBERRY ET AL VS JOHN BALFANZ HOMES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 THRONEBERRY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against JOHN BALFANZ HOMES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0850

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOMBERA, ABEL

MARTINEZ, NORMAN

FRANCO, DOLORES

LOMBERA, NICOLE

BREWER, TRAVIS

MAMATTAH, ANITA

PAYETTE, MARK

BRAVO, RAMIRO

AVALOS, MARIA

MARTINEZ-JONES, ARACELI

KOOREN, DEREK

OAKES, DOUGLAS

PEEL, VICTOR

PAYETTE, DEIDRE

THRONEBERRY, AMANDA

BRAVO, SONIA

CURIEL, JUAN

GALLARDO, BERTHA

MARTINEZ, MIRELLA

JOHNSON, RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WANKE, BLAINE J

Other Attorneys

MONJE, RICHARD A

MOORE, ALEXANDER R

HAYS, ANDREW W

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

FIDGER, ANGELA R

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

GONZALEZ, SCOTT M

AU, PATRICK

BOGGS, JOSIAH

VAN BLARCOM, DOUGLAS J

LAWRENCE, LISA I

MEJIA, MATTHEW

PATRICIA, MCDONALD A

TRAGISH, MURRAY

MULLEN, RAY T

PEZOLD, DANIEL G

COY, KATIE L.

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management conference hearing date does not match our calendar, Please correct and resubmit.

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/29/17 Plaintiff's, JOEL & AMANDA THRONEBERRY Motion to Appoint Special Master ResID: 28468 **Transferred to Dept. 10 for Hearing Only Dept. 11 Dark**

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 12-12-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 11/30/2017: Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Ruling

Ruling 11/30/2017: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA FACSIMILE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER. COMPLEX FEES ARE DUE AT THE TIME OF FILING ALONG WITH FIRST APPEARANCE FEES.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF JURY FEES, COSS COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS. COMPLEX CASE FEES MUST BE PAID WITH FIRST APPEARANCE FEE.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re 3.110 and CMC: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/2/17 Hearing Time: 830 am Hearing Department/Division:11

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont'd from 3/11/19 to allow for mediation to be reset; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Cross Defendant; Attorney: HAYS, ANDREW W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Intervenor-PL; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MEJIA, MATTHEW; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MEJIA, MATTHEW; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: PEZOLD, DANIEL G

Ruling

Ruling 05/28/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: In the process of appointing new special master due to death of Jube Najarian as of 11/19/18 plan on attending mediation in Feb 2019; Parties Present Cross Defendant; Attorney: TRAGISH, MURRAY; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Cross Defendant; Attorney: HAYS, ANDREW W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: COY, KATIE L.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: LAWRENCE, LISA I; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Intervenor-PL; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MEJIA, MATTHEW; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MEJIA, MATTHEW; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Complainant; Attorney: TRAGISH, MURRAY; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Defendant; Attorney: MONJE, RICHARD A; Cross Defendant; Attorney: TRAGISH, MURRAY; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Cross Defendant; Attorney: HAYS, ANDREW W; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Defendant; Attorney: COY, KATIE L.; Cross Defendant; Attorney: LAWRENCE, LISA I; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MONJE, RICHARD A; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Plaintiff; Attorney: FOSTER, JESSICA C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: FIDGER, ANGELA R; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Intervenor-PL; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Defendant; Attorney: MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C; Cross Complainant; Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L; Cross Complainant; Attorney: TRAGISH, MURRAY; Cross Defendant; Attorney: SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: DUPLICATE FILING OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Lena M. Louis Document: Fees submitted with Answer to Cross-complaint filed 5/04/2018 by Cross-defendant, Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc. Fees have already been posted as of 10/16/2017. See attached.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Tina Schoneman Document: Answer to Cross-Complaint Please select the proper document description with the fees of $1435.00 First Appearance Fee and Complex Fees are due with filing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Amendment to Complaint must have a designated area for judicial officer's approval. Returned via e-file

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/3/2018 CROSS-DEFENDANT FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY, INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT PICKINPAUGH CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE BY INTERVENOR FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY O BEHALF OF CROSS-DEFENDANT PICKINPAUGH CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC. ResID: 28748

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: settled *BMC WEST, LLC only remaining Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: as to the Cross-Complaint of BMC West, LLC - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to the Cross-Complaint filed by TOWERY HOMES, INC. on 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 07/30/2020: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: As to Cross-Complaints of BMC WEST, LLC; TOWERY HOMES, INC. cont'd from 3/5/20 ***reset from 05/28/2020 per standing order ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Balfanz-Throneberry; JBH Ntc of Entry of Dism for X-Complaint 7-27-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Balfanz-Throneberry; JBH Ntc of Entry of Dism of Cross-Complaint 7-27-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by JOHN BALFANZ HOMES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Dismissal: "Entire Action" cannot be dismissed, there is still 2 other active cross-complaints in this case. If you wish to dismiss your cross-complaint, uncheck "Entire Action" and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
253 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re 3.110 and CMC: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/13/2017; Served: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re 3.110 and CMC: Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/2/17 Hearing Time: 830 am Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 04/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Envelope Details Page 3 of 4

Associated Parties Party/Business Name

ROSEDALE CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION. INC.. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. OR

OTHLR IFORM OIF BUSINESS UNKNOWN

Summons Filing Type LEile Filing Code Summons

E Deserintion ROSEDALLE CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION. & P INC.’S SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Reference Number

Comments

Status Rejected Fees

Court Fee $0.00 Service Fee $0.00 Rejection Information

{R{zfsf)trzon Time Rejection Comment

19 - Reiccted 10/10/2017 11:11:532 COMPLEX FEE OF $1,000.00 MUST BE PAID WITH Jee AM FIRST APPERANCE FEE. Documents

Lead Document Summons on XC.pdf |Original]

Associated Parties

Party/Business Name

ROSEDALE CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION. INC.., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, OR

OTHER FORM OFIF BUSINESS UNKNOWN

Cross Complaint (No Fee) Filing Type EFile Filing Code Cross Complaint (No Fee)

https://california.tylerhost.net/EnvelopeDetails.aspx?envelopeguid=059b7168-¢969-457¢-... 10/10/2017

https://california.tylerhost.net/EnvelopeDetails.aspx?envelopeguid=059b7168-¢969-457¢-... 10/10/2017 Tina L. Schoneman. SBN 237211

Tina L. Schoneman. SBN 237211

CABRAI. | SCHONEMAN LI.P

200 E. Santa Clara Street. Suite 220 Ventura, CA 93001

Phone: (803) 633-4650/ Irax (803) 633-4655

Fing g c-sattorney s.com

Attorneys for Cross-Delendant ROSEDALE CONCRLETE CONSTRUCTION. INC.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATLE OFF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY Ol KERN

JOEIL. & AMANDA THRONLEBLERRY. ¢t Case No.: BCV-17-100850-DRL al..

Plaintifts.

ROSEDALE CONCRETE

V. CONSTRUCTION, INC.’S ANSWER TO o | JOHN BALFANZ HOMES, INC.’S CROSS- JOIIN BALFANZ HOMIL:S. INC.. ct al. .~ COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY

TRIAL

Defendants.

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS

Cross-Detendant. ROSEDALL CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION. INC.. (hereinatter “Cross-Defendant™) for itselt alone. answers the Cross-Complaint of JOHN BALFANZ HHOMLS. INC. (hereinafier ~Cross-Complainant(s)™) on file herein, and admits. denies and alleges as tollows:

I Under the provisions of Code of Civil Procedure §431.30. this answering Cross- Defendant denies. both generally and specifically. cach. every and all of the allegations contained in said Cross-Complaint. and the whole thereof. including cach and every purported cause of

action contained therein. and denies that the Cross-Complainant(s) sustained or will sustain