This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:03 (UTC).

THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC VS DEVORE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEVORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1681

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC

Defendant

DEVORE, JENELLE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 06/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) SC-133 MAILED TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC; Awarded Against: DEVORE, JENELLE; Amount; Damages: $1,045.85; Costs: $45.00; Total: $1090.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: VERONICA RODRIGUEZ FOR THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 06/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO JENELLE DEVORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: THREE-WAY CHEVROLET CADILLAC; Served: 04/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER (T)

    Read MoreRead Less