Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:22 (UTC).

THOME VS THOME

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 THOME filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOME. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1683

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOME, TIFFANY

Respondent

THOME, JONATHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2016
  • Copies Provided as Requested - Comment: DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: POS SUMMONS RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less