This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 10:29:18 (UTC).

THOMAS WILLIAM FARR DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 THOMAS WILLIAM FARR DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2968

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

EASON, CAMILLE

FARR BARKSDALE, JULIETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

FINCH, JOY A

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 12/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - LIMITED AUTHORITY NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Proof of publication filed 12/05/19 does not include language re petition request authority to administer estate under IAEA. Need new proof of publication.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of petition to administer estate to attorney Joy A. Finch

Ruling

Ruling 03/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objection to Petition for Probate; returned via file & serve

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 07/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - LIMITED AUTHORITY

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 09/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (Juliette Farr Barksdale's petition) 09/17/20 CALENDAR #02

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 12/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE LIMITED AUTHORITY (Camille Eason's petition) 12/18/20 CALENDAR #01

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order to set aside estate not exceeding $85,900 and to assign estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition for Letters 12/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING Re Petition to Set Aside Estate NOTE: 1. Need proof of notice that complies with PrC 6607(c) 12/18/20 CALENDAR #03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 12/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - RE LIMITED AUTHORITY (Camille Eason's petition) 12/18/20 CALENDAR #01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 12/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (Juliette Farr Barksdale's petition) 12/18/20 CALENDAR #02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Comment: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPetition (Subsequent) - Comment: Petition to Set Aside Estate Not Exceeding $85,900 and to Assign Estate (Probate Code 6600-6615)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 09/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - for limited authority (Camille Eason's petition) 09/17/20 CALENDAR #01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 09/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - (Juliette Farr Barksdale's petition) 09/17/20 CALENDAR #02

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 03/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of petition to administer estate to attorney Joy A. Finch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information - Comment: Confidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 12/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - LIMITED AUTHORITY NOTES - 1. Need proof of mailing. 2. Proof of publication filed 12/05/19 does not include language re petition request authority to administer estate under IAEA. Need new proof of publication.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Limited Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via in pro per out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLDFIELD, GERALD H