This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 10:45:57 (UTC).

THOMAS VS KRAZAN & ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 02/29/2012 THOMAS filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against KRAZAN ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Lampe, David R., Etienne, Linda S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6025

  • Filing Date:

    02/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Lampe, David R.

Etienne, Linda S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS, WILLIAM M

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PORTER-ROBERTSON ENGINEERING & SURVEYING, INC.

IRV GUINN CONSTRUCTION

FRENCH AND ASSOCIATES

THREE VIEWS, LLC

FRED PORTER & ASSOCIATES, INC.

KRAZAN & ASSOCIATES

HORNSBY, ISAAC WOODROW, III

FRENCH, JEFFERY AKENSON

COMPLETE POOLS

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

PORTER, FRED W

POTER-ROBERTSON ENGINEERING & SURVEYING, INC.

PORTER, FRED W.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

FRENCH AND ASSOCIATES

MIKE'S TRENCHING

THREE VIEWS, LLC

ISAAC WOODROW HORNSVY, III

KRAZAN & ASSOCIATES

HORNSBY III, ISAAC WOODROW

COMPLETE TOOLS

JEFFERY AKENSON FRENCH

COMPLETE POOLS

WEST VALLEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

QUIK FIX REPAIRS, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STUMP, MICHAEL J

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MONJE, RICHARD A

MALCOLM, STACEY L

PRENOVOST, THEODORE A

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

HAUT, ANDREW R

SWANSON, TIMOTHY

DUNKERLY, ERIN RENEE

MUIR, SAMUEL J

SORENSEN, ANDREW W

CRAWFORD, DAVID

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DUNKERLY, ERIN RENEE

MUIR, SAMUEL J

CRAWFORD, DAVID

SWANSON, JEREMY D

 

Court Documents

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 08/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Draft Incomplete

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 08/07/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 07/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 07/25/2017 (AMENDED): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing Application for Clarification of Court's ruling & add. 20 days to file 06/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing date: 5-31-17 Moving Party: Defendant Krazan and Associates Ex-Parte Application for Clarification of the Court's May 26, 2017 Ruling and Request for Additional 20 days to file Writ of Mandate

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 05/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO: (1) GRANT AN ADDITIONAL 20-DAYS TO FILE A WRIT PETITION (2) ADVANCE THE HEARING ON KRAZAN & ASSOCIATES MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; (3) AMEND THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/12/16 - M.O. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 9/21/16, by Defendant, West Valley Construction Company, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment. ResID: 18000

Motion to Strike

04/07/16 - M.O. - MOTION TO STRIKE/MOTION TO STRIKE/FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Defendant/Cross-Defendant, West Valley Construction Company. Motion to Strike Portions of Cross-Complaint.

Further Case Management Conference

03/03/16 - MO: MOTION TO STRIKE AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Jury Trial

Jury Trial 08/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Lodging rejected in File and Serve

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 6-19-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Reconsideration - Pre-Disposition (CL/CS/CV)

Ex Parte / Motion (x2) 06/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 5/26/17, by Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Krazan & Assoicates. Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Motion for Good Faith Settlement. ResID: 24880.

Ruling

Ruling on motion for reconsideration 06/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

06/08/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

RULING ON DEMURRER TO FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

08/06/2015 - FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 06/04/2015

Further Case Management Conference

CV276025 MO: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NO FURTHER STATEMENTS NEED TO BE FILED

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Subpoena records check in / check out slip with disposed records per notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Destruction of Subpoenaed Records Not Admitted - Comment: Records Destruction of subpoena records not admitted into evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFFS/COURTS/DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to defendant Jeffrey Akenson French dba French and Associates only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to defendant Irv Guinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to Cross-Complaint filed by Fred Porter, with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Isaac Woodrow Hornsby, III dba Complete Pools only

    Read MoreRead Less
716 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2012
  • DocketNotice of Hearing/Demurrer - Comment: RE:TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE HEARING DATE:5/10/12 HEARING TIME:8:30AM HEARING DEPT/DIV:4 ATTORNEY(S):RYAN M. DEAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: AS TO: IRV GUINN CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;ADR PACKAGE;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE OF MERIT;DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. STUMP IN SUPPORT THEREOF;NOTICE OF OSC RE:CRC, RULE 3.110;NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE;NOTICE OF CMC WHO SERVED: KRAZAN a& ASSOCIATES HOW SERVED:SUBSTITUTE DATE SERVED:3/9/12 SERVICE FEES: $73.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • Docket800N Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (10/19/10) - Comment: Amount of $395.00 for THOMAS, WILLIAM M (PL-1). Received from BORTON PETRINI, LLP, check no(s) 369842. Receipt #642422 for amount of $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN ON Aug 27, 2012 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 4 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "SPC" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE SIDNEY P CHAPIN ON Aug 27, 2012 AT 8:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 4 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet, Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 13, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 13, 2012 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA BORTON PETRINI BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketCertificate of Merit - Comment: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J STUMP IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY MICHAEL J STUMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY MICHAEL J STUMP

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.