This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 10:27:00 (UTC).

THOMAS HOFFMAN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 THOMAS HOFFMAN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall, Andrew and Kendall, Andrew B.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2575

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kendall, Andrew

Kendall, Andrew B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRAATZ, TRACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOUT, TINA K

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Confidential supplement; returned via file & serve

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 07/22/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Re: report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCreditors Claim - Comment: $119.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketBond Undertaking - Comment: $65,000.00/Harco National Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 07/22/2021: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: corrected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: first to petition for probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: The Daily Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Confidential supplement; returned via file & serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOUT, TINA K