This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:25 (UTC).

THOMAS E MORRE -VS- MARGARET O. DURONSLET & RENEE SMITH

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 THOMAS E MORRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARGARET O DURONSLET RENEE SMITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3396

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOORE, THOMAS E

KERNVILLE TRAILER PARK

Defendants

DURONSLET, MARGARET O

SMITH, RENEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: To Be, Assigned; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: WITH ACCRUED COSTS OF: $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ENTERED ON 4/03/13 ~ calid=2204184 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:05/20/2013, Courtroom:AK, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:TBA, Deputy:tinag, SystemDate:3/27/2013 3:31:34 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for MOORE, THOMAS E (PL-1). Received from THOMAS E MOORE, check no(s) 14113. Receipt #710178 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: MARGARET O. DURONSLET HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 03/27/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT WHO SERVED: RENEE SMITH HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 03/27/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON May 20, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AK OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ To Be Assigned Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON May 20, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AK OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ To Be Assigned Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for MOORE, THOMAS E (PL-1). Received from THOMAS E MOORE, check no(s) 14112. Receipt #709429 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 41

    Read MoreRead Less