This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 04:49:05 (UTC).

THOMAS BERCHTOLD VS HUTTON

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 THOMAS BERCHTOLD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUTTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1633

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERCHTOLD, THOMAS

Defendants

HUTTON, BRANDON

PULIDO-HUTTON, SARAH

OLIVER, DEE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110, dismissal & Sanctions 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 03/21/2017.

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 SANCTIONS & FCMC 03/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC plaintiff FTA on 02/16/2017

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference & osc 3.110 02/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 01/17/2017

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: AMENDED COMPLAINT: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON 10/26/16. MUST HAVE LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service for Sarah Pulido-Hutton. Defendant is not named as in First Amended Complaint.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service for Brandon Hutton. Party is not a named defendant.

Case Management Conference

**MO -3.110 & cmc Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: BERCHTOLD, THOMAS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; DOCUMENT IS INCOMPLETE

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/31/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: BERCHTOLD, THOMAS

First Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint: Comment: FILED BY THOMAS BERCHTOLD

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110, dismissal & Sanctions 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO APPEAR, COURT TO DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110, dismissal & Sanctions 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *******5TH CONTINUANCE*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110, dismissal & Sanctions 04/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 03/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 SANCTIONS & FCMC 03/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 02/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 SANCTIONS & FCMC 03/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiff fta on 02/16/2017. *****4TH CONTINUANCE********

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 SANCTIONS & FCMC 03/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC plaintiff FTA on 02/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: (PRO-PER BIN UNDER "B"To: Thomas Berchhold Re: Notice of Pendency of Action with a post it note reason: A post-it note is not an appropriate way to communicate with a judicial officer. Please submit a formal application and order for review and possible approval of the court. Note: the page attached to notice of pendency of action is for the use of a notary public not the court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: on complaint this date (PRO-PER BIN UNDER "B"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: AS TO THOMAS BERCHTOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/31/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 11/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO THOMAS BERCHTOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less