This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 09:54:59 (UTC).

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE PUBLIC WORKS BOARD VS PREMIERE PARTNERS IV, L.P., AN ILLINOIS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE PUBLIC WORKS BOARD filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against PREMIERE PARTNERS IV, L P , AN ILLINOIS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1688

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE PUBLIC WORKS BOARD

Defendants

CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., A CORPORATION

KERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ASSESSMENT DISTRICT

MAVERICK PETROLEUM, INC.

THE CONNORS COMPANY, LLC

PREMIERE PARTNERS IV, L.P., AN ILLINOIS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

VENOCO, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE CONNORS COMPANY, LLC.

ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BARNSDALL OIL COMPANY

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TENNECO OIL COMPANY

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AMERICAN PACIFIC INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIDELL, SCOTT ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY IS NOT NAMED AS NOTED IN THE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT FILED 9/1/2017.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO SCOTT B FRIDELL: REJECTING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT. VENCO, LLC IS NOT NAMED AS NOTED IN THE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT FILED 9/1/2017.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Amendment and request for dismissal.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Kristyne Moreno Document: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Kern Community College Assessment District Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. POS-010

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/7/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Working on Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: AS TO ENTIRE ACTION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: RELEASING DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Case Management Conference 01/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDisclaimer - Comment: Disclaimer of Defendant Energy Transfer Partners, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketDisclaimer - Comment: Disclaimer of Interest of Defendant Venoco LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Request for Entry of Default for Atlantic Richfield Company, Successor in Interest to Tenneco Oil Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Request for Entry of Default for Venoco LLC, Successor in Interest to the Connors Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to The Connors Company, LLC personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons to Kern Community College District Assessment District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Kristyne Moreno Document: Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Kern Community College Assessment District Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. POS-010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketDisclaimer - Comment: Disclaimer of Defendant Kern Community College District Assessment District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 08/07/2017; Served: 08/09/20171:05 PM; Served: 08/15/2017; Served: 08/09/20171:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/7/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Connor is a litigant

Latest cases where ENERGY TRANSFER PARTNERS, LP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Venoco, LLC et al. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant