This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 00:51:59 (UTC).

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE PUBLIC WORKS BOARD VS FABBRI ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE PUBLIC WORKS BOARD filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against FABBRI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2522

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE STATE PUBLIC WORKS BOARD

HIGH-SPEED RAIL AUTHORITY

Defendants

UNITED SECURITY BANK

SEMITROPIC WATER STORAGE DISTRICT

FABBRI, WENDY Y.

KERN COUNTY SOLID WASTE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM

CONTINENTAL TELEPHONE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

ONSHORE EXPLORATION CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DAN FABBRI FARMS

E. & J. GALLO WINERY

TENNECO OIL COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

FABBRI, DANIEL L.

MAVERICK PETROLEUM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MILDRED FABBRI AKA MILDRED IDA FABBRI

JORDAN KAUFMAN, KERN COUNTY TREASURER-TAX COLLECTOR

MAGNOLIA ALMONDS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORRAL, JESUS

Defendant Attorneys

EWELL, TROY T

PATRICK, JEFFREY J

WASSER, MARK A

KAHN, JAN L

BROWN, EUGENE, Jr.

MISNER, NICOLE M

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 11/15/2019: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Letter Requesting a Continuance: A letter requesting a continuance is not sufficient. In order to continue the MSC scheduled on Friday you must file a Stipulation and Order with the proper fees. Also this case is assigned to the Honorable Stephen D. Schuett, the order should reflect that.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT 04/23/18 OSC TO BE HEARD AT 8:15

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT 04/23/18 OSC TO BE HEARD AT 8:15

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 06/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 2/27/18 Plaintiff, STATE OF CALIFORNIA acting by and through the State Public Works Board Motion for Order for Possession ResID: 31021; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: CORRAL, JESUS

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: STIP TO CONTINUE - MISSING $20 FEE, SIGNATURE PAGE FOR JUDICIAL OFFICE AND RESID FOR NEW HEARING DATE

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service by Certified mail must have Acknowledgement of Receipt/Citation attached.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/7/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: JURY: 06/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: JURY: 06/22/20 TE: 5 DAYS SDS D-10 FCMC: 06/12/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: DOE 1: Magnolia Almonds, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: JURY 03/19/19 FCMC 03/08/19 T/E 5 DAYS, Cont'd 2/15/19, per Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/15/2019: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: Hrg: 11/15/19 @ 9:00 am in Dept.11 as to Fabbri Defendant's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Letter Requesting a Continuance: A letter requesting a continuance is not sufficient. In order to continue the MSC scheduled on Friday you must file a Stipulation and Order with the proper fees. Also this case is assigned to the Honorable Stephen D. Schuett, the order should reflect that.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDisclaimer - Comment: Disclaimer of Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: as to Defendant United Security Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (United Security Bank)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Fabbri Farms)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (W. Fabbri)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Fabbri)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/02/2017; Served: 11/05/2017; Unserved; Served: 12/28/2017; Served: 11/03/2017; Served: 11/06/2017; Served: 11/07/2017; Served: 11/08/2017; Served: 11/03/2017; Served: 11/03/2017; Served: 11/06/2017; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/7/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less