This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 09:51:59 (UTC).

THE PREWETT FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 THE PREWETT FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall, Andrew B. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3007

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kendall, Andrew B.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DE MATTEI, DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAKE, STEPHEN M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew B.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Petition to Compel Accounting & Distribution of Assets from Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition to Compel Accounting & Distribution of Assets from Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAKE, STEPHEN M