Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 08:58:14 (UTC).

THE ESTATE CORY BEAUFORD VS SANCHEZ, M.D.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 THE ESTATE CORY BEAUFORD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SANCHEZ, M D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0997

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ESTATE OF CORY BEAUFORD BY AND THROUGH THE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE, DENISE BEAUFORD

Defendants

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND STATE EMPLOYEES, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKOWN

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN

IRENE SANCHEZ, M.D,, A PUBLIC CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

BRIMHALL PHARMACY INC., A CORPORATION

MARK GREENSPAN, INC., A CORPORATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF THE CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION WASCO STATE PRISON, A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION, FORM UNKNOWN

IRENE SANCHEZ, M.D.

EK HEALTH SERVICES INC., A CORPORATION

PAIN INSTITUTE OF CENTRAL CALIFORNIA, INC., A CORPORATION

PALENCIA, ARTURO, M.D.

FISCHER, CARMEN, M.D.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION

IRENE SANCHEZ M.D. A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAAFAR, PAULINA H

YEREMIAN, ARPINEH

Defendant Attorneys

THELEN, DENNIS R

MURPHY, MOLLY S

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Amendment to Complaint: Document indicates Los Angeles County. Names listed for the DOE's are not clear.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Summons: 3rd Notice: Summons does not conform to the Complaint. Please review all Parties listed on the Complaint. The Summons and Complaint must match word for word

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Summons; Parties do not conform to Complaint. Please review all Parties listed on the Complaint. The Summons must match the Complaint word for word

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/20/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Designation of Trial Attorney and Declaration in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint by Defendants Irene Sanchez, M.D., and Irene Sanchez, M.D. a Professional Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Assignement to Judge Barmann in Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to State of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation Wasco State Prison a business organization, form unknown via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to EK Health Services Inc., a corporation via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann, Dept. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Carmen Fischer, M.D. Doe 2 via sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe 1 as Arturo Palencia, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe 2 as Carmen Fischer, M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Amendment to Complaint: Document indicates Los Angeles County. Names listed for the DOE's are not clear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Summons: 3rd Notice: Summons does not conform to the Complaint. Please review all Parties listed on the Complaint. The Summons and Complaint must match word for word

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Summons; Parties do not conform to Complaint. Please review all Parties listed on the Complaint. The Summons must match the Complaint word for word

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/08/202112:00 PM; Served: 06/04/20211:22 PM; Served: 06/07/20213:40 PM; Served: 06/04/20211:41 PM; Served: 06/11/202111:30 AM; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 06/05/202110:35 AM; Served: 06/09/20214:23 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/20/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAAFAR PAULINA H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEREMIAN ARPINEH