This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 16:42:11 (UTC).

THE CITY OF RIDGECREST VS. FLOURNOY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 THE CITY OF RIDGECREST filed an Other lawsuit against FLOURNOY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2323

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE CITY OF RIDGECREST, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondents

MILLER A. FLOURNOY JR. A DECEASED INDIVIDUAL

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY INTEREST IN REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 501 GARIS AVENUE, RIDGECREST, CALIFORNIA

GERTIE R. FLOURNOY , A DECEASED INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POPE, AMANDA A.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Amanda A. Pope Re: Summons Reason:Please re-file with mandatory judicial council Summons form. (SUM-100). File into the case number you will receive.

Petition

Petition 12/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: For Order to Abate Public Nuisance and Appointment of Receiver ***Further Hearing**** Cont. from 12/02/20

Petition

Petition 12/02/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Order to Abate Public Nuisance and Appointment of Receiver

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Publication from the Daily Report Prepare and attach to the mandatory POS-010.

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 10/14/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Exparte for Plaintiff in regards to Application for Order Directing Service of Summons.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Per Commissioner a hearing is required according to CRC 3.1176.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Amanda A. Pope Re: Summons Reason:Please re-file with mandatory judicial council Summons form. (SUM-100). File into the case number you will receive.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/20/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Cont. from 04/05/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Case Management Conference 04/05/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Petitioner's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Apptg Receiver and CMC and Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: appointing Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketTo ensure the public has access to court proceedings - Comment: during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court will be audio live streaming all non-confidential matters. This alternative method for observing courtroom proceedings is strongly encouraged during this time for all non-parties to avoid attending court in-person where social distancing protocols and limited courtroom access applies. It is also available because Judicial Officers may have to limit, or impose other reasonable restrictions upon, public access to their courtrooms and adjacent hallways based on recommended social distancing requirements. Each judge retains the discretion and authority to refuse, limit or terminate audio live streaming of the proceedings, or portions thereof, pursuant to the factors and prohibitions articulated in California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, and in consideration of other statutory and constitutional provisions. By Court Order and California Rules of Court, rule 1.150, audio live streams may NOT be recorded, broadcasted or rebroadcasted without prior written permission from the Court. Witnesses who have been instructed not to discuss their testimony or court proceedings with others may not listen to the audio streaming of any portion of the trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 12/16/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: For Order to Abate Public Nuisance and Appointment of Receiver ***Further Hearing**** Cont. from 12/02/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketBond Undertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/29/2020; Served: 10/29/2020; Served: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Amanda A. Pope Re: Summons Reason:Please re-file with mandatory judicial council Summons form. (SUM-100). File into the case number you will receive.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/20/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Per Commissioner a hearing is required according to CRC 3.1176.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of E Beatty iso City's Petition for Appointment of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of L Moy iso City's Petition for Order to Abate Public Nuisance and Appointment of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Srgt Marrone iso City's Petition for Order to Abate Public Nuisance and Appointment of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: For Order to Abate public nuisance and appointment of receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF RIDGECREST is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL PERSONS CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Alquist Pope