This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:53 (UTC).

THAHIM ET AL VS WHITSON

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 THAHIM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WHITSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2287

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THAHIM, ZAINAB

THAHIM, ZARA

THAHIM

Defendants

WHITSON, JEFFREY J

WHITSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, KYLE W

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: AS TO ENTIRE ACTION, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account $ 4842.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money - Comment: in Blocked Account $6204.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: intob blocked account as to Minor, Zainab Thahim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: as to Minor, Zainab Thahim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Minor, Zara Thahim

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketPetition For Minors Compromise - Comment: Petitioner: Frank Thahim Claimant: Zainab Thahim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketPetition For Minors Compromise - Comment: Petitioner: Frank Thahim Claimant: Zara Thahim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SOUTH VALLEY ATTORNEY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: AS TO ZARA THAHIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: AS TO ZAINAB THAHIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/16/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.