This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 07:03:33 (UTC).

TEU VS BHULLAR

Case Summary

On 11/10/2010 TEU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BHULLAR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Palmer, William D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2112

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Palmer, William D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRANS ENERGY USA

TEU PRODUCT COMPANY

Defendants

AJIT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BHULLAR, RAJPAL S

FIFTH WHEEL TRUCK STOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROUSES, BERNADETTE C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2012
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: TOTAL: $299,964.38 ISSUED: 02/08/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Docket117B Pmt: Abstract Issued GC 70626(A)(2) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for TEU PRODUCT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from DANIELS, FINE, ISRAEL, SCHONBU, check no(s) 54455. Receipt #632166 for amount of $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: HEARING MAY BE VACATED IF DEFAULT JUDGMENT EARLIER ENTERED HEARING MAY BE VACATED IF DEFAULT JUDGMENT EARLIER ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=1614993 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4145, CourtDate:07/14/2011, Courtroom:15, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:10, SessionType:CCM, Judge:WDP, Deputy:JENIFERG, SystemDate:6/13/2011 2:14:01 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Comment: IN FAVOR OF TEU PRODUCT COMPANY DBA TRANS ENERGY USA AGAINST FIFTH WHEEL TRUCK STOP, RAJPAL S BHULLAR AND AJIT INC. IN THE SUM OF $229,964.38. **PALMER***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • DocketNP1430 - Comment: Department: 15 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: APPEARANCE TELEPHONICALLY BY COURTCALL BY BERNADETTE CASTILLO BROUSES ON BEHALF OF TEU PRODUCT COMPANY (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. *************************************************************************************** THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: CAUSE CONTINUED TO 07/14/11 AT 8:00 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 15 FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. HEARING MAY BE VACATED IF DEFAULT JUDGMENT EARLIER ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • Docket4153 Case Management Conference - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Palmer, William D.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2011
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: BERNADETTE BROUSES ESQ DANIELS FINE ISRAEL 1801 CENTURY PARK EAST LOS ANGELES CA RE: TEU VS BHULLAR Case No. S-1500-CV-272112, WDP NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS _X_ The attached COURT JUDGMENT FORM papers are being returned for the following reason(s):PER JUDGE PALMER: WHY IS THIS IN KERN COUNTY RATHER THAN FRESNO COUNTY SINCE THE PROPERTY IS IN FRESNO?/DOCUMENT RETURNED BACK VIA RETURN MAILING. __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:TEU VS BHULLAR Case No. S-1500-CV-272112, WDP __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE. Calendar Notes: TO: BERNADETTE BROUSES ESQ DANIELS FINE ISRAEL 1801 CENTURY PARK EAST LOS ANGELES CA RE: TEU VS BHULLAR Case No. S-1500-CV-272112, WDP NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS _X_ The attached COURT JUDGMENT FORM papers are being returned for the following reason(s):PER JUDGE PALMER: WHY IS THIS IN KERN COUNTY RATHER THAN FRESNO COUNTY SINCE THE PROPERTY IS IN FRESNO?/DOCUMENT RETURNED BACK VIA RETURN MAILING. __ Your pleadings have been filed; however, this matter will not be calendared for the following reason(s): __ Fee of $___________ required for _____________________. Additional fee of $___________ required. __ Filing fee of $_________________ returned. Check No. ____________________. __ Civil Case Cover Sheet required. __ Signature missing: __ Not an original. Copies not acceptable. __ Acknowledgement of Receipt must be attached to a completed Proof of Service. __ Superior Court case number / Judge's initials: __wrong __missing. __ Does not conform to Rule 2.100 - 2.119 / 3.250 / California Rules of Court. __ Attach proof of Service on opposing party. __ Correct Proof of Service as follows:_____________________________________________________. __ Default cannot be entered. Reason:_____________________________________________________. __ This pleading does not appear to be for Superior Court, Kern County. __ Summons does not conform to Complaint / Cross-Complaint. Page: 1 of 2 NOTICE OF REJECTION / REQUEST FOR CORRECTIONS (continued) RE:TEU VS BHULLAR Case No. S-1500-CV-272112, WDP __ Not submitted timely under provisions of CCP Section 1005 and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1300. __ Date you have noticed is a court holiday. __ Hearing must be renoticed for another date: Judge is unavailable from ____________________ to ____________________. Matter will be calendared at time of filing renotice with the court. NO FEE. __ Must be renoticed for ________________ a.m. in Department/Division ____________. __ Answer to complaint must accompany stipulation to set aside default. __ To dismiss entire action, need joinder of ____________________________________________________. __ Dismissal cannot be entered. Reason: ______________________________________________________. __ Need to submit dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Kern County Local Rule 336(e). __ Consolidated matter: any case numbers to which the dismissal applies must be listed in the body of the document under "other". __ Answer filed: you will be notified of trial date. __ Must file application for Writ of Possession. __ Does not conform to Kern County Local Rule __________________________________. __ Consolidated matter: all case numbers must be listed in the heading with the lead case. __ Does not conform to California Rules of Court, Rule ____________________________. __ Must use Mandatory Judicial Council form. __ Order page does not contain enough information regarding case; need at least three lines of text with identifying information for order and case (short case title and case number). __ Item(s) # _________________________________ incomplete. __ Other: _______________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________ ______________________________________________________________________________. ANY CORRESPONDENCE REQUIRING AN ANSWER FROM THE COURT MUST BE ACCOMPANIED BY A STAMPED, SELF ADDRESSED ENVELOPE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: 2/23/11, OSC HRG VACATED-POS FILED ALL DEFTS. 2/14/11. ~ calid=1440325 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:02/23/2011, Courtroom:15, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:WDP, Deputy:keishag, SystemDate:12/6/2010 2:50:12 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;ADR PACKAGE;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF OSC RE:CRC, RULE 3.110;SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO CMCS;NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE;NOTICE OF CMC WHO SERVED: FIFTH WHEEL TRUCK STOP, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN HOW SERVED:PERSONAL DATE SERVED:1/25/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;ADR PACKAGE;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF OSC RE:CRC, RULE 3.110;SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO CMCS; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE;NOTICE OF CMC WHO SERVED: AJIT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HOW SERVED:PERSONAL DATE SERVED:1/25/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: WHAT SERVED:SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;ADR PACKAGE;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF OSC RE:CRC, RULE 3.110;SPECIAL RULES RELATING TO CMCS;NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE;NOTICE OF CMC WHO SERVED: RAJPAL S. BHULLAR, AN INDIVIDUAL HOW SERVED:SUBSTITUTE DATE SERVED:MAILED, 1/31/11 SERVICE FEES: $

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • DocketNotice / Assign / Status / JES - Comment: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "WDP" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER ON May 09, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ORDER OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE, THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER FOR ALL PURPOSES. IT WILL BE MANAGED ON THE DIRECT CALENDAR PROGRAM IN DEPARTMENT 15 UNTIL ITS CONCLUSION. PEREMPTORY CHALLENGES, IF ANY, MUST BE MADE WITHIN THE TIMES SET OUT IN CCP SECTION 170.6. PLEASE INCLUDE THE INITIALS "WDP" AFTER THE CASE NUMBER ON ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS FILED IN THIS CASE. TO EACH PARTY AND TO THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR EACH PARTY IN THIS ACTION: THIS CASE IS SET FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, BY THE HONORABLE WILLIAM D PALMER ON May 09, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 15 OF THIS COURT. CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS ARE TO BE FILED AT LEAST 15 DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH CRC Rule 3.720 - 3.730. APPEARANCE BY THE ATTORNEY RESPONSIBLE FOR THE TRIAL OF THIS ACTION IS MANDATORY. NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: You are required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date with the service of the Summons, Complaint (Local Rule 3.8 (a)), ADR Information Packet,Civil Mediation Information Brochure, and ADR Stipulation and Order Form. [CRC, Rule 3.221] NOTICE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL IMPORTANT: If you are bringing a cross complaint against new parties, you are, likewise, required to serve this Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference date on the new cross defendants.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Feb 23, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_15 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Feb 23, 2011 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_15 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Docket800N Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (10/19/10) - Comment: Amount of $395.00 for TEU PRODUCT COMPANY (PL-1). Received from TEU, check no(s) 52573. Receipt #558377 for amount of $395.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 432

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ajit, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEU PRODUCT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROUSES BERNADETTE CASTILLO