This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:16:53 (UTC).

TERRILL VS CLEMENTS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 TERRILL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLEMENTS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and DelPellegrino, Victoria. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0458

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRILL, RUSSELL

Defendants

CLEMENTS, DARLENE

CLEMENTS, LAWRENCE

CLEMENTS, JUSTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: TERRILL, RUSSELL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 24324 Juniper Ave Boron, CA 93519; Awarded Against: CLEMENTS, LAWRENCE; CLEMENTS, DARLENE; CLEMENTS, JUSTIN; Party: Names: TERRILL, RUSSELL; CLEMENTS, LAWRENCE; CLEMENTS, DARLENE; CLEMENTS, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: for Kern - Pick up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: for Lawrence Clements, Darlene Justin, Justin Clements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: for Justin Clements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: for Lawrence Clements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: for Darlene Clements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketApplication and Order - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TERRILL, RUSSELL; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NEW UD FILING

    Read MoreRead Less