This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 03:44:54 (UTC).

TERINO VS HERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2016 TERINO filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S., Lampe, David R., Friedman - Retired, Gary T. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1479

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERINO, EDWARD O.

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, ROBERT J.

TYCOON INVESTMENTS, INC.

500 WHITE LANE LP

HERNANDEZ, DAPHNA L.

500 WHITE LANE MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARPER, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

CORCOVELOS, THOMAS CHRISTOPHER

VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Substitution of Attorney - Don Hart is not named in this action - Spoke with Mainak D'Attaray will re-submit correct substitution of attorney

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 05/04/18; JURY TRIAL 05/14/18; T/E 7 DAYS; Parties Present Plaintiff: TERINO, EDWARD O.; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL; Defendant: HERNANDEZ, ROBERT J.; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 05/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/11/17 Defendants, ROBERT J HERNANDEZ; DAPHNA L HERNANDEZ; 500 WHITE LANE MANAGEMENT, LLC; 500 WHITE LANE LP Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint ResID: 24474; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 02/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/9/17 Defendants, ROBERT J HERNANDEZ; DAPHNA L HERNANDEZ; 500 WHITE LANE MANAGEMENT, LLC; 500 WHITE LANE LP Demurrer to First Amended Complaint ResID: 23677; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - fcmc Public: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (cont'd from 08/15/2016); Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Ruling

Ruling 11/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

08/15/2016 Minute Order: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HARPER, MICHAEL; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY; Defendant; Attorney: VINING, SHERI CONNELLY

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sheri Connelly Vining Re: Proposed Order Reason: Please remove water mark from proposed order and re-submit. Also, double check on font size used before uploading.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Must obtain leave of court to file Complaint in Intervention. Returned via efile

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 04/16/19 Pending Motions- (status of Int-Deft-POS/DEFAULT

Ruling

Minute Order 05/17/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Mainak D. Attaray For: Substitution of Attorney Reason: Party being named on document is not a party to the case. Please contact the clerk's office with any questions.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Motion to Quash - case number incorrect and missing reservation number.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sheri Connelly Vining For: Case Management Statement Reason: Please upload your document with a better resolution.

Ruling

Minute Order 11/14/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Settlement conference statement rejected: Please separate Proof of service from Settlement conference statement. Upload as an individual lead document in the same envelope. Also, please inlude the time of the hearing on the front page of Settlement Conference statement. Returned via efile

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Continued from 04/03/2020 by Standing Order FCMC & CT 5/4/2020; TE 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sheri Connelly Vining Re: Proposed Order Reason: Please remove water mark from proposed order and re-submit. Also, double check on font size used before uploading.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 03/13/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 03/11/2020 Intervenor: Michael T. Stoller, Esq. Ex Parte Application for and Order to Permit Filing of Complaint in Intervention,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketOpposition to Motion - Comment: Defendants' Robert J. Hernandez, Daphna L. Hernandez and 500 White Lane Management, LLC, Opposition to Motion of Michael Stoller to File Complaint in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Ex Parte Application for and Order to Permit Filing of Complaint in Intervention,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Ex Parte - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Pre-Cleared Reservation Expired; Comment: 3/9/2020, Ex Parte application for Motion to Intervene, Intervenor, Michael Stoller , Attorney Steve Krum Contact: Michael Stoller 310-245-4028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Thomas Corcovelos New Attorney:Sheri Connelly Vining

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Thomas Corcovelos New Attorney:Sheri Connelly Vining

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Thomas Corcovelos New Attorney:Sheri Connelly Vining

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: HRG 8/15/16 @ 8:15 AM IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: DATE: 08/15/16 TIME: 8:15AM DEPT.: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TERINO, EDWARD O.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketRecords Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. SEE ENTRY 2181

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Receipt of Record

    Read MoreRead Less