This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:16:39 (UTC).

TEMPLE VS C. PFEIFFER ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 TEMPLE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against C PFEIFFER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bradshaw, J. Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2561

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bradshaw, J. Eric

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TEMPLE, TROY ALEXANDER

Respondents

C/O B. GADDIS

LCSW

KVSP

WARDEN

D. TARNOFF

MORIMOTO, NANAKO

C. PFEIFFER

APPEALS COORDINATOR

C/O J. GADDIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

BOOMER, JANINE W

WOODROW, ANDREW R

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 12/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: re: service of petition; Parties Present Petitioner: TEMPLE, TROY ALEXANDER

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO PETITION.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF MOTION: FAILURE TO CLEAR HEARING DATE/TIME FOR MOTION. DOES NOT COMPLY WITH CRC 3.1110(A).

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) 09/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: TEMPLE, TROY ALEXANDER; Respondent; Attorney: BOOMER, JANINE W; Respondent; Attorney: BOOMER, JANINE W

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO PETITION.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS: ALL PARTIES MUST BE LISTED ON ONE SUMMONS ONLY.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO YOUR PETITION.

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER RECEIVED: Pursuant To Honorable Judge Bradshaw The 'NFT' designation of this case is an internal designation that changes when the court receives a proof of service for the petition, or the case is otherwise ready to be set for trial, and the case is assigned for all purposes.

Ruling

Ruling 02/22/2019: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Demurrer 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 12/4/18. Request plaintiff to file Notice of Change of address.

Demurrer

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 12/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

Demurrer

Demurrer 10/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/29/18 Respondents C. Pfeiffer, J. Gaddis and Nanako Morimoto Demurrer to first amended petition for writ of mandate

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 05/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 04/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 02/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 12/12/17

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 02/22/2019: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer - Demurrer 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 12/4/18. Request plaintiff to file Notice of Change of address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Demurrer 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 12/4/18. Request plaintiff to file Notice of Change of address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: ADDRESSED TO ANDREW WOODROW WITH COPY OF MINUTE ORDER RULING OF 2/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: ADDRESSED TO CURRENT LITIGATION SPECIALIST CSP-SACRAMENTO -SAC WITH COPY OF MINUTE ORDER RULING 2/8/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: DIRECTED TO CURRENT LITIGATION SPECIALIST LOS ANGELES COUNTY -LAC WITH COPY OF MINUTE ORDER RULING 2/8/19 ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: DIRECTED TO CURRENT LITIGATION COORDINATOR- CSP-SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 12/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion (Pre-Disposition) - Motion (Pre-Disposition) 12/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: REQUEST TO WAIVE FEES: FEE WAIVER HAS BEEN PREVIOULSY FILED AND GRANTED. CASE IS STILL PENDING, THEREFORE NO NEW REQUEST TO WAIVE FEES IS NEEDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: PETITIONER TROY ALEXANDER TEMPLE Date of Letter: 04/07/17 Re: CLARIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Writ of Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: LETTER RECEIVED: Pursuant To Honorable Judge Bradshaw The 'NFT' designation of this case is an internal designation that changes when the court receives a proof of service for the petition, or the case is otherwise ready to be set for trial, and the case is assigned for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO TROY ALEXANDER TEMPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TEMPLE, TROY ALEXANDER; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO TROY ALEXANDER TEMPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less