This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 23:57:14 (UTC).

TEJEDA VS KEPHART ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 TEJEDA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KEPHART. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1384

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEJEDA, SALVADOR

Defendants

FRIENDLY LOAN CO.

KEPHART, ERMA C.

KEPHART, JAMES L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEROKIM KOUSHA

Defendant Attorney

DESSY RONALD D

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/06/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

06/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

06/14/2022: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

06/14/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

08/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/22/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/22/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/22/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

09/15/2022: Answer to Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/15/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Case Management Statement

11/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

01/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

01/12/2023: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: for Plaintiff, Salvador Tejeda; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: for Plaintiff, Salvador Tejeda; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRIENDLY LOAN CO.|DEFENDANT - KEPHART, ERMA C.|DEFENDANT - KEPHART, JAMES L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Answer to Complaint x 2; Duplicate Filings Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - FRIENDLY LOAN CO.|DEFENDANT - KEPHART, ERMA C.|DEFENDANT - KEPHART, JAMES L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Friendly Loan Co., via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Erma C Kephart, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: James L. Kephart, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet: Please provide page 2 of 2. Please correct and re-file into the existing case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/27/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TEJEDA, SALVADOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DESSY RONALD D