This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 14:10:53 (UTC).

TEHACHAPI UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT VS KEON

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 TEHACHAPI UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************-APP

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TEHACHAPI UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Respondent

KEON, PATTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PARK, BRYAN J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling on Trial De Novo 04/25/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Trial De Novo

Trial De Novo 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: TEHACHAPI UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; Attorney: PARK, BRYAN J; Respondent: KEON, PATTI

Trial De Novo

Trial De Novo: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Court Transfer; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: PARK, BRYAN J; Respondent: KEON, PATTI

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketExhibit(s) List - Comment: PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Small Claims Appeal - Judgment - After Trial De Novo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketJudgment for Petitioner after Trial de Novo - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling on Trial De Novo 04/25/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Trial De Novo 04/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Trial De Novo: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Court Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Small Claims Appeal; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Small Claims Appeal; File Date: 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketNotice of Appeal from Small Claims/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.