This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 08:39:03 (UTC).

TEHACHAPI TRAILS END PARK LLC VS TROUSSEL, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2016 TEHACHAPI TRAILS END PARK LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TROUSSEL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0476

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEHACHAPI TRAILS END PARK LLC

Defendants

TROUSSEL, JOHNATHON

TROUSSEL, TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAL, VINCENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: TEHACHAPI TRAILS END PARK LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 533 E H ST TEHACHAPI CA 93561; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: TROUSSEL, JOHNATHON; TROUSSEL, TIFFANY; Party: Name: TEHACHAPI TRAILS END PARK LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO VINCENT REAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: JOHNATHON TRUSSEL, TIFFANY TROUSSEL, & ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE, ENTRY OF DEFAULT, JUDGMENT, APPLICATION FOR WRIT, & WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: TIFFANY TROUSSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: JOHNATHON TROUSSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TEHACHAPI TRAILS END PARK LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.