This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 08:19:51 (UTC).

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. VS HOFFMAN

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOFFMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0173

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

Defendant

HOFFMAN, RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/19/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

01/19/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

01/19/2023: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

03/21/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default Entered

03/21/2023: Request for Entry of Default Entered

Electronic Rejection Notice

04/04/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

03/28/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Statement

05/02/2023: Statement

Declaration

05/02/2023: Declaration

Request for Court Judgment

05/02/2023: Request for Court Judgment

Judgment by Default by Court

05/10/2023: Judgment by Default by Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: Against Randall Hoffman aka Randy Scott Hoffman dba Red Zone Sports Bar and Grill; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Court Judgment; Comment: As to Randall Hoffman aka Randy Scott Hoffman dba Red Zone Sports Bar and Grill on complaint filed 1/19/23; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration Of James Buller in support for Default Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement; Comment: statement of the Case 585D; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Request for Clerk Judgment packet- Resubmit as a Request for Court Judgment, a Clerk does not have the Authority to approve when taking evidence into account is required. // Also Does not conform to CRC 3.1806 Original Contract required or Declaration and Order for Judicial Officer to approve the use of copies.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-50; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default Entered; Comment: As to Randall Hoffman aka Randy Scott Hoffman dba Red Zone Sports Bar and Grill on Complaint filed 1/19/23; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: As to Randall Hoffman aka Randy Scott Hoffman, dba Red Zone Sports Bar and Grill sub-served 2/01/23; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 5/4/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - TECHNOLOGY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less