This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:32:07 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS VALENCIA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALENCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0276

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

VALENCIA, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARKOON, ANNA C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TD BANK USA, N.A.; Served: 09/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARKOON ANNA C