This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:55:29 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5790

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

PEREZ, JESIKA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN, JEREMY

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Jesika M Perez. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less