This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 14:47:34 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS GIBSON

Case Summary

On 12/29/2015 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIBSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0145

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

GIBSON, JOHN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT, MARK B

VLACHOS, MICHAEL

LOHSE, NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

MO - Continuance: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Re:Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern/Returned Original via ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: Returned Endorsed Copy via ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern/Returned Original via ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: Returned Endorsed Copy via ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: TD BANK USA, N.A.; Awarded Against: GIBSON, JOHN A; Amount; Damages: $2,742.95; Costs: $314.00; Total: $3056.95; Party: Names: TD BANK USA, N.A.; GIBSON, JOHN A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total $ 3056.95 As To; John A Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: For Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re:Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: As to John A Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/08/20169:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By substituted service as to John A Gibson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less