This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:43:45 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS FETTERS

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FETTERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0580

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

FETTERS, TINA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FREEDMAN, JEREMY

VLACHOS, MICHAEL

LOHSE, NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: CLERK'S DEFAULT PACKET ADDRESSING MONEY & NOTICE OF CHANGE HANDLING ATTORNEY & NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) 10/12/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: TD BANK USA, N.A.; Awarded Against: FETTERS, TINA C; Amount; Damages: $2,618.28; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $314.00; Total: $2932.28; Party: Names: TD BANK USA, N.A.; FETTERS, TINA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: Lost Original Contract and Statements

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: for judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE; Brief Summary of the Case Pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1800(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Computation of Interest and Lack - Comment: of Original Executed Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Waiver of Attorney Fees by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default Entered - Comment: as to Tna C. Fetters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): #1A INCORRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Tina C Fetters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.