This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/07/2020 at 10:24:36 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. VS CASTRO

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTRO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0098

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

CASTRO, VERONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERK, CAMRYN P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Veronica Castro, 2 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to defendant Veronica Castro, 2 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.