This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 09:52:14 (UTC).

TAYLOR VS TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 TAYLOR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TAYLOR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0080

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TAYLOR, TEENA MARIE

Respondent

TAYLOR, MICHAEL ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: TAYLOR, TEENA MARIE; TAYLOR, MICHAEL ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 10/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketJudgment Checklist (FL-182)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.