This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 19:03:58 (UTC).

TAYLOR VS JACO OIL COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/07/2016 TAYLOR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JACO OIL COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0474

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMANTHA TAYLOR, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED

TAYLOR, SAMANTHA

Defendants

FASTRIP FOOD STORES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JACO OIL COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JACO OIL COMPANY

FASTRIP FOOD STORES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN, EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 09/26/2016: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 09/06/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/5/16 Defendants, JACO OIL COMPANY and FASTRIP FOOD STORES, INC. Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint ResID: 17645 Transferred to Department 11 for hearing only. Department 17 is dark.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA; Defendant; Attorney: FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA

Ruling

**MO - Public: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer

Demurrer

07/11/2016 Minute Order: Demurre & Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 6/6/16 Defendants, JACO OIL COMPANY and FASTRIP FOOD STORES, INC. Demurrer to Complaint ResID: 16203; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA; Defendant; Attorney: FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 6/16/16: Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Department Transfer

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

05/25/16 MO - EX PARTE HEARING - PRE-DISPOSITION: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing date: 5-24-16 Application to shorten time for hearing on motion for protective order Moving party: Jaco Oil Company and Fastrip Food Stores, Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to Law & Motion minute order dated 07/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CS/PB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: THE ENTIRE COMPLAINT, AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION THERIN, ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Edwin Aiwazian In Support of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; EACH DOCUMENT MUST BE UPLOADED AS ITS OWN LEAD DOCUMENT. EXAMPLE: LEAD DOCUMENT - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL LEAD DOCUMENT - DECLARATION LEAD DOCUMENT - PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketOrder on Motion - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ****JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE****10/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Defendants' Statement re: Class Action Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of opposition to ex parte and declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Elizabeth M.R. Parker In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time or in the Alternative to Stay Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: Re: Certificate of Inability to Respond filed 5-2-16 Ruling: extension of time granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 6-6-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNE VIA ACS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/21/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FASTRIP FOOD STORE is a litigant

Latest cases where JACO OIL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCO CHAVEZ, O VANESSA