Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:03:10 (UTC).

Tate VS Tate

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 Tate filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Tate. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0086

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tate, Julie Ann

Respondent

Tate, David Franklin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Response - Comment: Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: FRWD TO MOJAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less