This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:53:23 (UTC).

TAPIA VS VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 TAPIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0107

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAPIA, SILVESTRE Z

Defendant

VAZQUEZ, CLAUDIA

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition)

MO - Fee Waiver Hearing 121715: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Ruling; Parties Present Plaintiff: TAPIA, SILVESTRE Z

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: TAPIA, SILVESTRE Z; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 12904 Poppy Lane (bedroon) Lamont, CA 93241 Kern; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: VAZQUEZ, CLAUDIA; Party: Names: TAPIA, SILVESTRE Z; VAZQUEZ, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 12904 Poppy Lane Lamont, CA 93241 Kern Returned via In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Claudia Vasquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by Personal Service as to Claudia Vazquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) - MO - Fee Waiver Hearing 121715: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: TAPIA, SILVESTRE Z; Served: 12/09/201510:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 12904 POPPY LN (ROOM) LAMONT, CA 93241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less