This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 05:32:45 (UTC).

TALLY ET AL VS HIGHT

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 TALLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HIGHT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Schuett, Stephen D., Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1334

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TALLY, ROBERT MICHAEL

TALLY, JILL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HIGHT, TRACY

EDGAR, ELIZABETH

EDGAR, BRIAN

Cross Defendants

EDHAR, BRIAN

EDGAR, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWEN, SUSAN A

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HUTCHINSON, THOMAS H

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Pursuant to 3.1385 - as to Complaint and Cross-Complaint

Ruling

Minute Order 08/29/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement - Cross-Complaint

Ruling

Minute Order 08/27/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 07/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/10/19 Defendant, TRACY HIGHT Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication ResID: 34121

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Veatch Carlson LLp For: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Reason: New reservation ID # for Motion to Compel must be listed on stipulation.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Larry Peake Re: Answer to Cross-Complaint, Duplicate. Answer to Cross-Complaint has been filed as of 03/15/2019.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Brian Edhar For: Stipulation and Order Reason: Default has been set aside pursuant to Minute Order Ruling Dated 1/30/19.

Ruling

Ruling 01/30/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: DEFAULT FILED 10/25/2018 IS SET ASIDE.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Brian Edgar Re: Answer to Cross-Complaint, Please contact the Clerk's Office to discuss this matter. Main Line: 661-868-7204.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont CONT'D 05/15/17, 08/14/17, 12/12/17, 02/15/18, 04/05/18, 06/14/18 08/22/18 Outstanding issues -Remaining Defts

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D 05/15/17, 08/14/17, 12/12/17, 02/15/18, 04/05/18, 06/14/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (cont'd from 05/15/17; 08/14/17 12/12/17 02/15/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: (cont'd from 05/15/17; 08/14/17 12/12/17)

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: AMENDMENTS TO COMPLAINT RETURNED VIA E-FILE

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/28/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: pursuant to 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: T/E 5-8 DAYS; Cont'd per Stip 7/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: TRJ 09/03/19 **Remaining defts should be defaulted ** Cont'd per Stip 7/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice - as to Entire Action - Returned via E-File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 10/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Pursuant to 3.1385 - as to Complaint and Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: FCMC 8/23/19, JT 9/3/19 T/E 5-8 Days; Cont'd per Stip 7/31/19 - XComplaint Remains Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: Notice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 08/29/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: re: Notice of Settlement - Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: FILED BY TRACY HIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: AS TO TRACY HIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/28/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/10/2017; Unserved; Served: 04/02/2018; Served: 04/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.